Moreno, Jacqueline Ann (CPSO#: 95588)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
190 Catharine Street South
Hamilton ON  L8N 2K3
Phone: (905) 547-7854
Fax: (905) 545-8767
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Complex Care Unit
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
Phone: 9055221155
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jacqueline A. Moreno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Moreno ( CPSO# 95588 )

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
190 Catharine Street South
Hamilton ON  L8N 2K3
Phone Number: (905) 547-7854

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE ANN MORENO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORENO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013