Morgan, Andrew William (CPSO#: 86203)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental
Health Sciences
FPRU
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone: (905) 668-5881 Ext. 6960
Fax: (905) 665-2455
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: 416-461-8272
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Durham Mental Health Services
519 Brock St. S.
Whitby ON  L1N 4K8
Canada
Phone: 905-666-0831
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew W. Morgan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Morgan ( CPSO# 86203 )

Business Address:
Corrections Canada
330 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M6P 2K7
Phone Number: (416) 762-8171

Business Address:
Ontario Shores
Forensic Psychiatry Division
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone Number: (905) 430-4055

Business Address:
Durham Mental Health Services
519 Brock Street South
Whitby ON  L1N 4K8
Phone Number: (905) 666-0831

Business Address:
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW WILLIAM MORGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012