Morgan, Ingrid (CPSO#: 95653)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4001 Leslie St
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 756-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ingrid Morgan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Morgan ( CPSO# 95653 )

Business Address:
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 15 Feb 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. INGRID MORGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 15 Feb 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Feb 2017 to 05 Mar 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2017