Morin, Richard Henry (CPSO#: 91680)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard Morin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Morin ( CPSO# 91680 )

Business Address:
Orillia Soldiers Memorial
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 252-9209

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD HENRY MORIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009