Moro, Eduardo Rodrigo Puppi (CPSO#: 80401)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Jan 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jan 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidade Federal Do Parana, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2003 to 31 Mar 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2004 to 04 Jan 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Jan 2005