Moro, Elena (CPSO#: 78638)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Trieste, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2002
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Oct 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Oct 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Aug 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 21 Oct 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2013