Morong, Sharon Elizabeth (CPSO#: 86642)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Apr 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2630 Rutherford Road, Unit #200
Vaughan ON  L4K 0H2
Phone: (416) 548-4039
Fax: (647) 722-5440
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

13291 Yonge Street, Unit #401
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Canada
Phone: (905) 773-1599
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

2025 Midland Avenue, Suite #302
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2
Canada
Phone: (416) 292-3218
Fax: (416) 292-3200
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2025 Midland Avenue, Suite #302
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2
Canada
Phone: (416) 292-3218
Fax: (416) 292-3200
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

7117 Bathurst Street, Unit #101
Thornhill ON  L4J 2J6
Canada
Phone: (905) 597-6222
Fax: (905) 597-4622
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sharon Morong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Morong ( CPSO# 86642 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
2630 Rutherford Road
Vaughan ON  L4K 0H2
Phone Number: (416) 548-4039

Business Address:
B24 - 2810 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 3L2
Phone Number: (289) 963-1644

Business Address:
208 - 4235 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 1T7
Phone Number: (416) 292-3218

Business Address:
101 - 7117 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 2J6
Phone Number: (905) 597-6222

Business Address:
Suite 401
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-7759

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARON ELIZABETH MORONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2013