Morra, Antonella (CPSO#: 76951)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1
1146 Birchview Drive
Mississauga ON  L5H 3C8
Phone: (905) 271-7500
Fax: (905) 271-6800
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTONELLA MORRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 09 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2002