Morriello, Florence Filomena (CPSO#: 87275)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Ferrara, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 416 340-4800
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Critical Care Med
237 Barton Street
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Florence Morriello Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Morriello ( CPSO# 87275 )

Business Address:
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FLORENCE FILOMENA MORRIELLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRIELLO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 13 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Mar 2016
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2015