Morris, Christopher Thomas (CPSO#: 95105)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
77 Westmount Road
Guelph ON  N1H 5J1
Phone: (519) 824-7272
Fax: (519) 824-0833
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Morris Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Morris ( CPSO# 51248 )
Dr. C. Morris ( CPSO# 51243 )
Dr. C. Morris ( CPSO# 95105 )

Business Address:
205 - 77 Westmount Road
Guelph ON  N1H 5J1
Phone Number: (519) 824-7272


Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Thomas Morris Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Morris ( CPSO# 95105 )

Business Address:
77 Westmount Road
Guelph ON  N1H 5J1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER THOMAS MORRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016