Morris, Davina Susan (CPSO#: 93625)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Sunnyside Building
Suite 403
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-530-6455
Fax: 416-530-6709
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Davina Morris Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Morris ( CPSO# 93625 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Care
Sunnyside Building
Suite 4S 403
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 27 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVINA SUSAN MORRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014