Morrison, Stephen Theodor (CPSO#: 88963)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
339 Windermere Road
Room C3 125
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3283
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen Morrison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Morrison ( CPSO# 88963 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
339 Windermere Road
Room C3 125
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3283

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN THEODOR MORRISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRISON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 26 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 27 Jul 2010 to 26 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 27 Jul 2011 to 26 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 27 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013