Mortazavi, Amir Ali (CPSO#: 77455)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 May 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 May 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Azari, English, French, Persian

Education:University of Montreal, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 4G
4773 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2N 0G2
Phone: (416) 221-2772
Fax: (416) 221-3464
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rapid Cardiology Assessment Clinic
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue, Suite A-216
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 2484
Fax: (416) 480-4209
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amir Mortazavi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mortazavi ( CPSO# 77455 )

Business Address:
Unit 4G
4773 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2N 0G2
Phone Number: (416) 221-2772

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite A 216
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIR ALI MORTAZAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORTAZAVI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 2002