Moser, Michael Anthony Joseph (CPSO#: 72120)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 1998 to 15 May 1998
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 2011 to 30 Nov 2011
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 May 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012