Moskovitz, David Norman (CPSO#: 74794)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1040 Eglinton Ave West
Toronto ON  M6C 2C5
Phone: 647-559-4007
Fax: 416-443-2083
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David N. Moskovitz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Moskovitz ( CPSO# 74794 )

Business Address:
140 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6C 2C5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 27 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID NORMAN MOSKOVITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOSKOVITZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004