Moss, Judy Maureen (CPSO#: 54482)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Moss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Moss ( CPSO# 54482 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Records Location

Address: Orleans Family Health Clinic: 101-210 Centrum Blvd, Orleans, ON K1E 3V7 Fax: (613) 837-3781 Tel: (613) 837-5454
Instructions: Patients last date seen 2012 or earlier may contact Dr. Judy M. Moss at: jmossmpc@gmail.com
Date Received: 31 May 2018


Address: Orleans Family Health Clinic: 101-210 Centrum Blvd, Orleans, ON K1E 3V7 Fax: (613) 837-3781 Tel: (613) 837-5454
Instructions: Patients last date seen 2012 or earlier may contact Dr. Judy M. Moss at jmossmpc@gmail.com
Date Received: 31 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018