Moss, Katelyn Dawn (CPSO#: 95099)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: Hoenselaar, Katelyn Dawn (used until: 13 Sep 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11 Lakeside Terrace
2nd Floor, Suite 201
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone: 705-881-9810
Fax: 705-881-9813
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M & K Moss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Moss ( CPSO# 98054 )
Dr. K. Moss ( CPSO# 95099 )

Business Address:
201 - 11 Lakeside Terrace
2nd Floor
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone Number: (705) 881-9810

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATELYN DAWN MOSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOSS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 07 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2013