Moss, Leslie Anne (CPSO#: 92192)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 19 Oct 2009 to 15 Nov 2009
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2013