Moss, Matthew James (CPSO#: 98054)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: 705-728-9090
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M & K Moss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Moss ( CPSO# 98054 )
Dr. K. Moss ( CPSO# 95099 )

Business Address:
201 - 11 Lakeside Terrace
2nd Floor
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone Number: (705) 881-9810

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 15 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW JAMES MOSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOSS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014