Mossanda Chabikuli, Kenyabu Clara (CPSO#: 87773)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Medical University of South Africa(Medun, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
240 Penetanguishene Road
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone: (705) 527-7575
Fax: (705) 527-7571
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chabikuli Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mossanda Chabikuli ( CPSO# 87773 )
Dr. S. Chabikuli ( CPSO# 86024 )

Business Address:
Suite 103
240 Old Penetanguishene Road
P O Box 790
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 527-7575

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENYABU CLARA MOSSANDA CHABIKULI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOSSANDA CHABIKULI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 03 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2011