Motakis, Dimitrios (CPSO#: 91936)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:McGill University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
199 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 2J3
Phone: (416) 925-5775
Fax: (416) 925-6717
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dimitrios Motakis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Motakis ( CPSO# 91936 )

Business Address:
1st Floor
199 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 2J3
Phone Number: (416) 925-5775

Business Address:
150 York Street
14th Floor
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone Number: (416) 350-5900

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIMITRIOS MOTAKIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOTAKIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2009