Motamedi, Farhad (CPSO#: 76295)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4K7
Phone: (613) 761-4334
Fax: (613) 761-4200
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Farhad Motamedi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Murray ( CPSO# 76241 )
Dr. F. Motamedi ( CPSO# 76295 )

Business Address:
210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4K7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4334

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FARHAD MOTAMEDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOTAMEDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2003