Mott, Daniel Dwight (CPSO#: 77473)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stratford General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone: (519) 272-8210
Fax: (519) 272-8247
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Mott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mott ( CPSO# 77473 )

Business Address:
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210

Business Address:
St. Mary's Memorial Hospital
267 Queen Street West
St Marys ON  N4X 1B6
Phone Number: (519) 284-1332

Business Address:
Seaforth Community Hospital
24 Centennial Drive
Seaforth ON  N0K 1W0
Phone Number: (519) 482-3440

Business Address:
Clinton Public Hospital
98 Shipley Street
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0
Phone Number: (519) 482-3440

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL DWIGHT MOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOTT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007