Mott, Shelley Margaux Mariette (CPSO#: 96322)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
OSMH
170 Colborne St West
Orillia ON  L3V2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHELLEY MARGAUX MARIETTE MOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOTT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2013