Mottaghian, Mojgan (CPSO#: 84843)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Islamic Azad University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
York Central Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mottaghian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mottaghian ( CPSO# 84843 )

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health
York Central Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOJGAN MOTTAGHIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOTTAGHIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Apr 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 May 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 24 Apr 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 25 Apr 2009 to 24 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 25 Apr 2010 to 24 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 25 Apr 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012