Moudgil, Bineet (CPSO#: 94556)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Feb 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2009 long lake road
Northwood Medical Clinic
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone: (705) 222-9038
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1280 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 1Y8
Canada
Phone: 7055223380
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

93 Notre Dame Ave. W, Azilda
Sudbury ON  P0M 1B0
Canada
Phone: 7055223380
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

1813 lasalle blvd
Sudbury ON  P3A 2A3
Canada
Phone: 7052229038
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

80 Elm Street
Sudbury ON  P3C 1T2
Canada
Phone: 7055223380
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. Moudgil Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Moudgil ( CPSO# 94556 )

Business Address:
Lasalle All Day Walk-In Clinic
1813 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 2A3
Phone Number: (705) 222-9038

Business Address:
1280 Lasalle Boulevard
Suite 102
Sudbury ON  P3A 1Y8
Phone Number: (705) 522-3380

Business Address:
2009 Long Lake Road
Suite 101
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone Number: (705) 522-3380

Business Address:
93 Notre Dame Avenue West
Azilda ON  P0M 1B0
Phone Number: (705) 522-3380

Business Address:
80 Elm Street
Sudbury ON  P3C 1T2
Phone Number: (705) 522-3380

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BINEET MOUDGIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUDGIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 25 Oct 2010 to 16 Jan 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 17 Jan 2011 to 23 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 24 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 18 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Feb 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2014