Moulin, Jana Marie (CPSO#: 88531)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wonderland Medicentre
1375 Beaverbrook Ave
London ON  N6H 0J1
Phone: (519) 471-6686
Fax: (519) 471-2801
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Sep 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANA MARIE MOULIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOULIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 02 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2010