Moulton, Jonathan Alexander Riggs (CPSO#: 113830)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Sep 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 19 Dec 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen's University
Department of Family Medicine
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-9303
Electoral District: 06

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN ALEXANDER RIGGS MOULTON shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MOULTON is enrolled at QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. MOULTON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MOULTON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. MOULTON shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MOULTON is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MOULTON no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 26 Sep 2017 to 18 Dec 2017
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 19 Dec 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 24 Sep 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 25 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019