Mount, Victoria Anne-Lii Hyatt (CPSO#: 90703)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: Sillberg, Victoria Anne-Lii Hyatt (used until: 05 Aug 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

500 King St. W.
Unit 2
Oshawa ON  L1J 2K9
Canada
Phone: 905-576-3444
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Victoria A.H. Mount Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Mount ( CPSO# 90703 )

Business Address:
2 - 500 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2K9

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Jan 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VICTORIA ANNE-LII HYATT MOUNT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUNT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 14 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2014