Mountain, Garry Brett (CPSO#: 73426)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
118 Victoria Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 5W9
Phone: (519) 337-5000
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

69 Grand Avenue East
Chatham ON  N7L 1V8
Canada
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01

233 Cameron Street
Corunna ON  N0N 1G0
Canada
Phone: 519 813-9800
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mountain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Mountain ( CPSO# 73426 )

Business Address:
233 Cameron Street
Corunna ON  N0N 1G0
Phone Number: (519) 813-9800

Business Address:
1430 Dufferin Avenue
Wallaceburg ON  N8A 2W5
Phone Number: (519) 627-5800

Business Address:
Bluewater Health Hospital
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3

Business Address:
69 Grand Avenue East
Chatham ON  N7L 1V8
Phone Number: (519) 351-5800

Business Address:
118 Victoria Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 337-5000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARRY BRETT MOUNTAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUNTAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2001