Mousavi, Negareh (CPSO#: 85835)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Oct 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Islamic Azad University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Montreal QC  H4A 3J1
Phone: 5149341934

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 16 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 02 Jan 2007 to 31 Jan 2007
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Oct 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Negareh  Mousavi  may practice medicine independently in internal medicine
            and cardiology, only.