Moussa, Madeleine (CPSO#: 58087)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 36356
Fax: (519) 663-2930
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moussa Sadek-Botros Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 27 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MADELEINE MOUSSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUSSA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1991