Moussa, Raffy Cesario (CPSO#: 84396)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Building A 2nd Floor
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V1
Phone: (416) 431-8224
Fax: (416) 439-8625
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moussa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Moussa ( CPSO# 84396 )

Business Address:
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Building A-2nd Floor
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V1
Phone Number: (416) 431-8224

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAFFY CESARIO MOUSSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUSSA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2009