Moussadji, Jack Saul (CPSO#: 72568)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 2000

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Suite 208
Maple ON  L6A 4P9
Phone: (289) 553-7711
Fax: (289) 553-7722
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jack Moussadji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Moussadji ( CPSO# 72568 )

Business Address:
208 - 955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Maple ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (289) 553-7711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACK SAUL MOUSSADJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUSSADJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2000

Pending Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Moussadji’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that during a medical appointment(s), Dr. Moussadji sexually abused Patient A and/or engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by, including other things, inappropriate physical contact with Patient A which included rubbing/pressing himself against the patient, asking Patient A questions of a sexual nature unrelated to a medical examination, and laughing at Patient A.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): Motion date: March 18, 2019 Hearing dates: July 8-11, 2019