Mozessohn, Lee (CPSO#: 91054)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Odette Cancer Centre
Sunnybrook health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-5847
Fax: 416-480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Mozessohn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Mozessohn ( CPSO# 91054 )

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
K2 Wing
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-3325

Business Address:
Odette Cancer Centre
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
T2 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5847

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 07 Nov 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEE MOZESSOHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOZESSOHN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013