Mozzon, Jeremy Bradley (CPSO#: 86870)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fort William FHO
1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone: (807) 626-1234
Fax: (807) 623-8832
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeremy Mozzon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mozzon ( CPSO# 86870 )

Business Address:
Fort William FHO
1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone Number: (807) 626-1234

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEREMY BRADLEY MOZZON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOZZON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2009