Mozzon, Lise Michelle (CPSO#: 91084)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
984 Oliver Road
Office 300-A
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone: (807) 344-8289
Fax: (807) 344-8212
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
Internal Medicine Clinic
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (808) 684-6753
Fax: (807) 684-5865
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lise M. Mozzon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Mozzon ( CPSO# 91084 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Science Centre
Office 300-A
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone Number: (807) 344-8289

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Emo Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities Emo
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Notre-Dame Hospital Hearst
Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities Rainy River
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISE MICHELLE MOZZON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOZZON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013