Mrkonjic, Linda Antonija (CPSO#: 71871)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 12 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 1997 to 31 Jul 1998
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1999