Muamenah, Hane Mohammad S (CPSO#: 92027)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Umm Al Qura University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Oct 2009
PEAP - Resident - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 31 Oct 2009 to 30 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 31 Oct 2010 to 30 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 31 Oct 2011 to 30 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 31 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 31 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 31 Oct 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jan 2017
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2017