Muftah, Salmin Issa M (CPSO#: 85617)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Garyounis University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Sep 2006 to 23 Oct 2006
PEAP - Resident - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2006 to 23 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2007 to 23 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2008 to 12 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2009 to 12 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2010 to 12 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011