Mugalu, Jamiir (CPSO#: 85878)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Makerere Univ, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 19 Mar 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 20 Mar 2007 to 30 Apr 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2007