Muhammad, Amin Ali (CPSO#: 91940)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 May 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 May 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Sindhi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue,
St. Catharines, ON
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: 289-398-1009
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Medical Arts Building
Suite 409
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Canada
Phone: (905) 997-8182
Fax: (905) 997-8183
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amin Muhammad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Muhammad ( CPSO# 91940 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
409 - 2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 997-8182

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland
Newfoundland and Labrador
Pakistan
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIN ALI MUHAMMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUHAMMAD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Aug 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 2010