Muhlstock, Joshua Peter (CPSO#: 77859)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 506
3027 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3G7
Phone: (905) 333-5100 Ext. 5
Fax: (905) 333-5107
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Muhlstock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Muhlstock ( CPSO# 77859 )

Business Address:
506 - 3027 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3G7
Phone Number: (905) 333-5100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSHUA PETER MUHLSTOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUHLSTOCK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007