Mui, Jimmy Ka Yeung (CPSO#: 65719)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Dundee, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Durham Regional Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 2655
Fax: (905) 721-6101
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jimmy Mui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mui ( CPSO# 65719 )

Business Address:
Durham Regional Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JIMMY KA YEUNG MUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Sep 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997