Muinuddin, Ahmad (CPSO#: 88834)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Queensway Health Centre
Oncology Clinic
150 Sherway Drive, Toronto, Ontario
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone: (416) 521-4110
Fax: (416) 521-4122
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ahmad Muinuddin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Muinuddin ( CPSO# 88834 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Queensway Health Centre
Oncology Clinic
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 209-8577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHMAD MUINUDDIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUINUDDIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 04 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2013