Mujoomdar, Aneil Arvind (CPSO#: 73726)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 25 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2005
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2006