Mukherjee, Ashok (CPSO#: 58002)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 May 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 410
325 Milner Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1B 5N1
Phone: (416) 284-4744
Fax: (416) 284-0141
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rouge Valley Centenary
Health Centre
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mukherjee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Vupputuri ( CPSO# 59330 )
Dr. A. Mukherjee ( CPSO# 58002 )

Business Address:
410 - 325 Milner Avevnue
Scarborough ON  M1H 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 438-3088

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 24 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHOK MUKHERJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUKHERJEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 May 1987 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 May 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1988