Mukherjee, Sanjib Kumar (CPSO#: 22649)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 May 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 May 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Calcutta, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2960 Drew Rd
Unit 153
Mississauga ON  L4T 0A5
Phone: (647) 741-1000
Fax: (905) 677-2507
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Richmond Hill Cardiology Clinic
9625 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 5T2
Canada
Phone: (905) 237-6640
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Unit 110
385 Silverstar Blvd
Scarborough ON  M1V 0E3
Canada
Phone: (416) 242-2062
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Unit 1
7700 Bathurst St
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y3
Canada
Phone: (905) 597-7111
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sanjib Mukherjee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mukherjee ( CPSO# 22649 )

Business Address:
16700 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Phone Number: (905) 235-7427

Business Address:
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Suite 101
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone Number: (905) 799-2500

Business Address:
18 Kensington Road
Brampton ON  L6T 4S5
Phone Number: (905) 497-8177

Business Address:
2980 Drew Road
Mississauga ON  L4T 0A7
Phone Number: (905) 266-0246

Business Address:
7700 Bathurst Street
Suite 1B
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y3
Phone Number: (905) 597-7111

Business Address:
6 - 160 The Westway
Etobicoke ON  M9P 2C1
Phone Number: (416) 242-2062

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 May 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 May 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 May 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Aug 2004

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 25 Aug 2004 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Sanjib  Kumar  Mukherjee  may  practise  general  internal medicine,
                  including non-invasive cardiology.

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: December 20, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)