Mukhida, Alia Badrudin (CPSO#: 88999)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Milton Centre for Womens Health
311 Commercial Street
Suite 208
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone: (905) 875-2280
Fax: (905) 875-9172
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mukhida Zacny Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zacny ( CPSO# 88712 )
Dr. A. Mukhida ( CPSO# 88999 )

Business Address:
Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte Road South
Milton ON  L9T 9K1

Business Address:
Milton Centre for Womens Health
Suite 208
311 Commercial Street
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone Number: (905) 875-2280

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALIA BADRUDIN MUKHIDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUKHIDA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013