Mukhopadhyay, Baijayanta (CPSO#: 95354)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, French

Education:McGill University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Timmins and District Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone: (705) 267-2131
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

61 Queen Street
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B8
Canada
Phone: (807) 737-1802
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BAIJAYANTA MUKHOPADHYAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUKHOPADHYAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2013